THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 02:47:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond st, 9 Donnelly Wing
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168645015
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Evelyn Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Cheung (CPSO#: 103713 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Geriatrics
9 Donnelly Wing
Toronto ON M5B 1W8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond st, 9 Donnelly Wing
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168645015
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Evelyn Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Cheung (CPSO#: 103713 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Geriatrics
9 Donnelly Wing
Toronto ON M5B 1W8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVELYN NING MAN CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVELYN NING MAN CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014