THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:44:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: (647) 689-6978
Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Hospital
Women and Children's Health, Department of Pediatrics
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Division of Women and Children's Health
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 The Queensway
St Joseph's Hospital
Department of Children's Health
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 622 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M6G 1K7
Phone: 6474831502
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Jamal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jamal (CPSO#: 103736 )
Business Address: 622 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M6G 1K7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: (647) 689-6978
Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Hospital
Women and Children's Health, Department of Pediatrics
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Division of Women and Children's Health
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 The Queensway
St Joseph's Hospital
Department of Children's Health
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 622 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M6G 1K7
Phone: 6474831502
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Jamal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jamal (CPSO#: 103736 )
Business Address: 622 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M6G 1K7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALISHA NOORIN JAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALISHA NOORIN JAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014