THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/04/25 13:31:23 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Angeline St N
Lindsay ON K9V 4M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053246111
Extension: 0
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V5B7
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allison R. Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Martin (CPSO#: 103744 ) Dr. A. Chow (CPSO#: 93771 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Angeline St N
Lindsay ON K9V 4M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053246111
Extension: 0
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V5B7
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allison R. Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Martin (CPSO#: 103744 ) Dr. A. Chow (CPSO#: 93771 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY WILLIAM MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY WILLIAM MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014