THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:29:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: Beech, Sarah Lois Irene (Used Until: 09 Mar 2016)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 435 The Boardwalk
Suite 203
Medical Centre 2
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-243-2043
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Rinaldi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rinaldi (CPSO#: 103749 )
Business Address: 435 The Boardwalk
Suite 203
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2

General Information

Former Name: Beech, Sarah Lois Irene (Used Until: 09 Mar 2016)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 435 The Boardwalk
Suite 203
Medical Centre 2
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-243-2043
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Rinaldi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rinaldi (CPSO#: 103749 )
Business Address: 435 The Boardwalk
Suite 203
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH LOIS IRENE RINALDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RINALDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH LOIS IRENE RINALDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RINALDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Apr 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014