THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:18:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Dec 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SARAH MAXWELL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Maxwell (CPSO#: 103751 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7

Corporation Name: HB Maxwell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jul 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Dec 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SARAH MAXWELL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Maxwell (CPSO#: 103751 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7

Corporation Name: HB Maxwell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jul 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH KATHLEEN MAXWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAXWELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH KATHLEEN MAXWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAXWELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014