THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:31:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-122 Cornell Park Avenue
Markham Ontario L6B 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 437-248-1642
Fax: 905-910-0951

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Mui (CPSO#: 103766 )
Business Address: 1-122 Cornell Park Avenue
Markham Ontario L6B 1B6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-122 Cornell Park Avenue
Markham Ontario L6B 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 437-248-1642
Fax: 905-910-0951

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Mui (CPSO#: 103766 )
Business Address: 1-122 Cornell Park Avenue
Markham Ontario L6B 1B6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH DOROTHY MUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH DOROTHY MUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014