THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:20:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-878-2383
Fax: 855-422-3808
Address: 1-661 Martin St
Maplehurst Correctional Complex
Milton ON L9T 8Z1
Phone: 9058782383
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jenna Gray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gray (CPSO#: 103771 )
Business Address: 725 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
(905) 878-2383

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-878-2383
Fax: 855-422-3808
Address: 1-661 Martin St
Maplehurst Correctional Complex
Milton ON L9T 8Z1
Phone: 9058782383
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jenna Gray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gray (CPSO#: 103771 )
Business Address: 725 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
(905) 878-2383

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNA MARIE GRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNA MARIE GRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014