THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 15:02:55 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Great Northern Family Health Team
240 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 647-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan Adam Sayer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sayer (CPSO#: 103775 )
Business Address: Temiskaming Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
(705) 647-8121
Business Address: 240 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
(705) 647-6100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Great Northern Family Health Team
240 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 647-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan Adam Sayer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sayer (CPSO#: 103775 )
Business Address: Temiskaming Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
(705) 647-8121
Business Address: 240 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
(705) 647-6100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN ADAM SAYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAYER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN ADAM SAYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAYER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014