THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:40:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Owen Sound Family Health Team
1415 1st Ave West, Suite 2000
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashley Fraser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fraser (CPSO#: 103781 )
Business Address: Owen Sound Family Health Team
Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
(519) 470-3030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Owen Sound Family Health Team
1415 1st Ave West, Suite 2000
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashley Fraser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fraser (CPSO#: 103781 )
Business Address: Owen Sound Family Health Team
Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
(519) 470-3030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHLEY RHONA FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHLEY RHONA FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014