THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:24:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5-883 Mulock Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 8S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
3rd Floor
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linda Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Wong (CPSO#: 103788 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000
Business Address: Prince Edward Medical
324 Prince Edward Drive South
Toronto Ontario M8Y 3Z5
(647) 345-3048
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
Bay Centre for Birth Control
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 351-3700
Business Address: 5-883 Mulock Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 8S3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5-883 Mulock Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 8S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
3rd Floor
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linda Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Wong (CPSO#: 103788 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000
Business Address: Prince Edward Medical
324 Prince Edward Drive South
Toronto Ontario M8Y 3Z5
(647) 345-3048
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
Bay Centre for Birth Control
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 351-3700
Business Address: 5-883 Mulock Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 8S3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014