THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:27:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Department of Critical Care Medicine
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
ICU
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: YARNELL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Yarnell (CPSO#: 103790 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai ICU
600 University Avenue, Suite 18-210
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
4165864800
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
ICU
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Department of Critical Care Medicine
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
ICU
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: YARNELL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Yarnell (CPSO#: 103790 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai ICU
600 University Avenue, Suite 18-210
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
4165864800
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
ICU
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN YARNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YARNELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN YARNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YARNELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014