THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:00:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: Robinson, Emily Jane (Used Until: 14 Jun 2015)
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054748600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Emily Jane House Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. House (CPSO#: 103806 )
Business Address: 50 College Dr
North Bay ON P1B 0A4

General Information

Former Name: Robinson, Emily Jane (Used Until: 14 Jun 2015)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054748600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Emily Jane House Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. House (CPSO#: 103806 )
Business Address: 50 College Dr
North Bay ON P1B 0A4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY JANE HOUSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOUSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY JANE HOUSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOUSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014