THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:02:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 325 Margaret Avenue
Wallaceburg Ontario N8A 2A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193526400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 325 Margaret Ave
Wallaceburg Ontario N8A2A7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Sep 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site
LOCATION: Petrolia

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naveed-ul Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hassan (CPSO#: 103824 )
Business Address: Wallaceburg Medical Center
Unit 9
30 McNaughton Avenue
Wallaceburg Ontario N8A 1R8
(519) 627-1497

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 325 Margaret Avenue
Wallaceburg Ontario N8A 2A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193526400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 325 Margaret Ave
Wallaceburg Ontario N8A2A7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Sep 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site
LOCATION: Petrolia

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naveed-ul Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hassan (CPSO#: 103824 )
Business Address: Wallaceburg Medical Center
Unit 9
30 McNaughton Avenue
Wallaceburg Ontario N8A 1R8
(519) 627-1497

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVEED-UL HASSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVEED-UL HASSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 May 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 May 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2014