THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:06:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 381 Church Street
Oak Valley Health
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Infectious Diseases
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-472-7601
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 650 Church St
Salvation Army
Toronto Grace Health Centre
Toronto ON M4Y 2G5
Phone: (416) 925-2251
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony La Delfa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. La Delfa (CPSO#: 103852 )
Business Address: 381 Church St
Markham ON L3P 7P3
905-472-7601

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 381 Church Street
Oak Valley Health
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Infectious Diseases
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-472-7601
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 650 Church St
Salvation Army
Toronto Grace Health Centre
Toronto ON M4Y 2G5
Phone: (416) 925-2251
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony La Delfa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. La Delfa (CPSO#: 103852 )
Business Address: 381 Church St
Markham ON L3P 7P3
905-472-7601

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY JOSEPH LA DELFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LA DELFA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY JOSEPH LA DELFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LA DELFA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014