THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:38:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 806 College St
Dr. Sandy Van Weight Management
Toronto ON M6G 1C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: -
Fax: (416) 572-5877
Address: MEDCAN
1500-150 York St
Toronto ON M5H 3S5
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: 416-350-5981

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sandy Van Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Van (CPSO#: 103854 )
Business Address: 150 York Street
Suite 1500
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 806 College St
Dr. Sandy Van Weight Management
Toronto ON M6G 1C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: -
Fax: (416) 572-5877
Address: MEDCAN
1500-150 York St
Toronto ON M5H 3S5
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: 416-350-5981

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sandy Van Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Van (CPSO#: 103854 )
Business Address: 150 York Street
Suite 1500
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDY VAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDY VAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014