THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:18:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Avenue East
G845
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 518-8555
Fax: (905) 521-6156
Address: 2757 King Street East
Specialty Clinics, Room 1300
St. Joseph’s Healthcare-King Campus
Hamilton Ontario L8G 5E4
Phone: (905) 573-4823
Fax: (905) 521-6156

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HELENE RETROUVEY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Retrouvey (CPSO#: 103861 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Room G845
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
(905) 522-1155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Avenue East
G845
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 518-8555
Fax: (905) 521-6156
Address: 2757 King Street East
Specialty Clinics, Room 1300
St. Joseph’s Healthcare-King Campus
Hamilton Ontario L8G 5E4
Phone: (905) 573-4823
Fax: (905) 521-6156

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HELENE RETROUVEY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Retrouvey (CPSO#: 103861 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Room G845
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
(905) 522-1155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELENE RETROUVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RETROUVEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELENE RETROUVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RETROUVEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014