THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:25:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4440 Tecumseh Rd E
Central Cardiology Clinic
Windsor ON N8W 1K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 916-0993
Fax: (519) 916-0994

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 12 Oct 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Bagherli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bagherli (CPSO#: 103877 )
Business Address: 201 - 2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 997-6643
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: 4440 Tecumseh Rd E
Central Cardiology Clinic
Windsor ON N8W 1K5
(519) 916-0993
Business Address: 4440 Tecumseh Rd E
Central Cardiology Clinic
Windsor ON N8W 1K5
(519) 916-0993

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4440 Tecumseh Rd E
Central Cardiology Clinic
Windsor ON N8W 1K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 916-0993
Fax: (519) 916-0994

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 12 Oct 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Bagherli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bagherli (CPSO#: 103877 )
Business Address: 201 - 2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 997-6643
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: 4440 Tecumseh Rd E
Central Cardiology Clinic
Windsor ON N8W 1K5
(519) 916-0993
Business Address: 4440 Tecumseh Rd E
Central Cardiology Clinic
Windsor ON N8W 1K5
(519) 916-0993

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALIREZA BAGHERLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGHERLI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALIREZA BAGHERLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGHERLI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2014
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2014