THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:05:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 4727373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. DARYA YERMAK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yermak (CPSO#: 103881 )
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7373

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 4727373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. DARYA YERMAK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yermak (CPSO#: 103881 )
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7373

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARYA YERMAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YERMAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARYA YERMAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YERMAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014