THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:54:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Gordon Street
Ontario Shore Centre for Mental Health Sciences
Whitby Ontario L1N 9X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-430-4055
Extension: 6625
Fax: 905-665-2460
Address: 1940 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Health Network
Toronto Ontario M1L 4R1
Phone: 416-431-8135
Fax: 416-431-8233

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
LOCATION: Whitby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wang (CPSO#: 103917 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 461-8272
Business Address: CAMH
Unit 3 - 472
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Address: 700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
(905) 430-4055

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Gordon Street
Ontario Shore Centre for Mental Health Sciences
Whitby Ontario L1N 9X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-430-4055
Extension: 6625
Fax: 905-665-2460
Address: 1940 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Health Network
Toronto Ontario M1L 4R1
Phone: 416-431-8135
Fax: 416-431-8233

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
LOCATION: Whitby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wang (CPSO#: 103917 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 461-8272
Business Address: CAMH
Unit 3 - 472
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Address: 700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
(905) 430-4055

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW N J WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW N J WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 May 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 May 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014