THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:49:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 15B
1815 Ironstone Manor
Pickering Ontario L1W 3W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058311800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lee (CPSO#: 103922 )
Business Address: 15B - 1815 Ironstone Manor
Pickering Ontario L1W 3W9
(905) 831-1800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 15B
1815 Ironstone Manor
Pickering Ontario L1W 3W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058311800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lee (CPSO#: 103922 )
Business Address: 15B - 1815 Ironstone Manor
Pickering Ontario L1W 3W9
(905) 831-1800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2014
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2014