THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1730 St. Laurent Blvd
Unit 100
Ottawa ON K1G 5L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-746-2244
Fax: 613-739-2733
Address: 600-1730 St. Laurent Blvd
Herzig Eye Institute - Ottawa
Ottawa ON K1G 5L1
Phone: 613 800 1680
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus - University of Ottawa Eye Institute
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 6137378575
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 401 Smyth Rd
CHEO - Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Ophthalmology
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saama Sabeti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sabeti (CPSO#: 103936 )
Business Address: 610-1730 St. Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON K1G 3Y7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1730 St. Laurent Blvd
Unit 100
Ottawa ON K1G 5L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-746-2244
Fax: 613-739-2733
Address: 600-1730 St. Laurent Blvd
Herzig Eye Institute - Ottawa
Ottawa ON K1G 5L1
Phone: 613 800 1680
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus - University of Ottawa Eye Institute
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 6137378575
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 401 Smyth Rd
CHEO - Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Ophthalmology
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saama Sabeti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sabeti (CPSO#: 103936 )
Business Address: 610-1730 St. Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON K1G 3Y7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAAMA SABETI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABETI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAAMA SABETI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABETI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014