THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:13:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Southern Illinois School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Retina Centre
2211 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2B 7E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-226-7095
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1010 Belfast Rd
Ottawa ON K1G 4A2
Phone: 6132267095
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 03 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Colorado

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DRS. MCLAUGHLIN AND MILLER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Miller (CPSO#: 97835 ) Dr. J. McLaughlin (CPSO#: 103953 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesia
Room B309
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 722-7000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Southern Illinois School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Retina Centre
2211 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2B 7E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-226-7095
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1010 Belfast Rd
Ottawa ON K1G 4A2
Phone: 6132267095
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 03 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Colorado

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DRS. MCLAUGHLIN AND MILLER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Miller (CPSO#: 97835 ) Dr. J. McLaughlin (CPSO#: 103953 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesia
Room B309
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 722-7000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ADAM MCLAUGHLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLAUGHLIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ADAM MCLAUGHLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLAUGHLIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Southern Illinois School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2014