THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:18:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital
Kitchener-Waterloo Campus
835 King St W
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pardoe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pardoe (CPSO#: 103956 )
Business Address: PO Box 9056 Stn C
835 King St W
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital
Kitchener-Waterloo Campus
835 King St W
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pardoe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pardoe (CPSO#: 103956 )
Business Address: PO Box 9056 Stn C
835 King St W
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHLEY EMMA JERNAZ PARDOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARDOE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHLEY EMMA JERNAZ PARDOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARDOE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014