THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:19:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-472-7373
Fax: 905-472-7026
Address: Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 04 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melissa C. Lui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lui (CPSO#: 103974 )
Business Address: Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville ON L9W 4X9
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St
Markham ON L3P 7P3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-472-7373
Fax: 905-472-7026
Address: Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 04 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melissa C. Lui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lui (CPSO#: 103974 )
Business Address: Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville ON L9W 4X9
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St
Markham ON L3P 7P3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA CINDY LUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA CINDY LUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014