THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:08:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
30 Prospect Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 2357284
Fax: 9052357320

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anastasia Patmanidis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patmanidis (CPSO#: 103978 )
Business Address: 200-30 Prospect St
Newmarket ON L3Y 3S9
(905) 235-7284

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
30 Prospect Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 2357284
Fax: 9052357320

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anastasia Patmanidis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patmanidis (CPSO#: 103978 )
Business Address: 200-30 Prospect St
Newmarket ON L3Y 3S9
(905) 235-7284

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANASTASIA PATMANIDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATMANIDIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANASTASIA PATMANIDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATMANIDIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014