THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:15:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 18 King Street East
Suite 1400
Toronto Ontario M5C 1C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 947-1012
Fax: 1 (833) 479 - 0732

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.D.PHUA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Phua (CPSO#: 103982 )
Business Address: 18 King Street East
Suite 1400
Toronto Ontario M5C 1C4
(437) 370-0291

Corporation Name: P.D.Phua Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Apr 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 18 King Street East
Suite 1400
Toronto Ontario M5C 1C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 947-1012
Fax: 1 (833) 479 - 0732

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.D.PHUA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Phua (CPSO#: 103982 )
Business Address: 18 King Street East
Suite 1400
Toronto Ontario M5C 1C4
(437) 370-0291

Corporation Name: P.D.Phua Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Apr 2023

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Mar 2025
11 Sep 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 20 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Sep 11 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. PETER DANIEL PHUA may practise medicine independently in medical psychotherapy.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires 18 months from the date of issuance.

Note: This certificate is issued on 20 March, 2025. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 11 September, 2026.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. PETER DANIEL PHUA may practise medicine independently in medical psychotherapy.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires 18 months from the date of issuance.

Note: This certificate is issued on 20 March, 2025. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 11 September, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2025
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 19 Apr 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2025
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 11 Sep 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014