THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1547 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9067660137
Fax: 855 434 9002
Address: 237 Barton St E, Hamilton
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: 905 5212100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hala Kufaishi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kufaishi (CPSO#: 103985 )
Business Address: 1547 Hurontario St
The Weight Clinic- Mississauga ON L5G 3H7
9067660137

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1547 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9067660137
Fax: 855 434 9002
Address: 237 Barton St E, Hamilton
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: 905 5212100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hala Kufaishi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kufaishi (CPSO#: 103985 )
Business Address: 1547 Hurontario St
The Weight Clinic- Mississauga ON L5G 3H7
9067660137

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HALA FARID KUFAISHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUFAISHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HALA FARID KUFAISHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUFAISHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Dec 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014