THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:44:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-879-4112
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kawartha Clinic
168 Brock Street
Peterborough ON K9H 2P4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Krause Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Krause (CPSO#: 104000 )
Business Address: 33 Lindsay St S
Lindsay ON K9V 2L9
Business Address: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Business Address: 10 Angeline St N
Lindsay ON K9V 4M8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-879-4112
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kawartha Clinic
168 Brock Street
Peterborough ON K9H 2P4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Krause Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Krause (CPSO#: 104000 )
Business Address: 33 Lindsay St S
Lindsay ON K9V 2L9
Business Address: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Business Address: 10 Angeline St N
Lindsay ON K9V 4M8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATIE ELLEN-NORA KRAUSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAUSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATIE ELLEN-NORA KRAUSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAUSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014