THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:06:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bangalore Medical College, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dept. of Psychiatry
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Ct
ON L1G 2B9
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 11 A/B - 1400 Bayly Street
Pickering Ontario L1W 3R2
Phone: 9055768711
Extension: 34403
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 12 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neeraj Bajaj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bajaj (CPSO#: 104013 )
Business Address: A Wing Psychiatry
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711 Extn: 4253

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Bangalore Medical College, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dept. of Psychiatry
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Ct
ON L1G 2B9
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 11 A/B - 1400 Bayly Street
Pickering Ontario L1W 3R2
Phone: 9055768711
Extension: 34403
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 12 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neeraj Bajaj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bajaj (CPSO#: 104013 )
Business Address: A Wing Psychiatry
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711 Extn: 4253

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEERAJ BAJAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAJAJ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEERAJ BAJAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAJAJ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bangalore Medical College, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jan 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2014