THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:17:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: Kellam, Ashley Marie (Used Until: 28 Nov 2019)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus & Cancer Center
Windsor, ON
N8W 1L9
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashley Meloche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Meloche (CPSO#: 104059 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: Windsor Regional Cancer Center
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 2X3
(519) 253-5253

General Information

Former Name: Kellam, Ashley Marie (Used Until: 28 Nov 2019)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus & Cancer Center
Windsor, ON
N8W 1L9
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashley Meloche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Meloche (CPSO#: 104059 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: Windsor Regional Cancer Center
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 2X3
(519) 253-5253

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHLEY MARIE MELOCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MELOCHE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHLEY MARIE MELOCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MELOCHE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014