THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:17:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4239 Petrolia Line
Petrolia Ontario N0N1R0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198820190
Fax: 5198823776

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site
LOCATION: Petrolia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lincoln Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lam (CPSO#: 104078 )
Business Address: 4239 Petrolia Line
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
(519) 882-0190

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4239 Petrolia Line
Petrolia Ontario N0N1R0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198820190
Fax: 5198823776

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site
LOCATION: Petrolia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lincoln Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lam (CPSO#: 104078 )
Business Address: 4239 Petrolia Line
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
(519) 882-0190

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINCOLN YIN KWAN LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINCOLN YIN KWAN LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014