THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:10:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 40533
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joundi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Joundi (CPSO#: 104089 )
Business Address: 73 Kitty Murray Lane
Hamilton Ontario L9K 1H7
4168894992
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5A8
905-594-0581

Corporation Name: Joundi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Feb 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 40533
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joundi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Joundi (CPSO#: 104089 )
Business Address: 73 Kitty Murray Lane
Hamilton Ontario L9K 1H7
4168894992
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5A8
905-594-0581

Corporation Name: Joundi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Feb 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAED AHMAD JOUNDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOUNDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAED AHMAD JOUNDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOUNDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014