THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:38:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
115 Dehli Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Phone: (226) 234-1236
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 12 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Cosby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cosby (CPSO#: 104092 )
Business Address: 115 Delhi St
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
2262341236

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
115 Dehli Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Phone: (226) 234-1236
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 12 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Cosby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cosby (CPSO#: 104092 )
Business Address: 115 Delhi St
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
2262341236

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN COSBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSBY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN COSBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSBY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014