THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:29:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 86 Dearham Wood
Scarborough ON M1E 1S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-282-6066
Fax: 1-800-708-9888

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Aug 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Serio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Serio (CPSO#: 104093 )
Business Address: 86 Dearham Wood
Serio Family Clinic
Scarborough ON M1E 1S4
416-282-6066

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 86 Dearham Wood
Scarborough ON M1E 1S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-282-6066
Fax: 1-800-708-9888

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Aug 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Serio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Serio (CPSO#: 104093 )
Business Address: 86 Dearham Wood
Serio Family Clinic
Scarborough ON M1E 1S4
416-282-6066

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAMIANO SERIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SERIO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAMIANO SERIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SERIO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Feb 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 May 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014