THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:38:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3603 Highway 7
102
Markham Ontario L3R 8W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3655092311
Fax: 3655092280
Address: 36 Vodden Street East
203
Brampton Ontario L6V 4H4
Phone: 9054592700
Fax: 6476893014
Address: MCI The Doctor's Office Royal Bank
200 Bay St.
Toronto Ontario M5J 2J1
Phone: (416) 368-6787
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Seifer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Seifer (CPSO#: 104094 )
Business Address: 203-36 Vodden Street
Brampton Ontario L6V 4H4
(647) 484-3857
Business Address: 1408 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6K 1L9
(416) 532-8277
Business Address: 209 - 1 Yordale Road
Toronto Ontario M6A 2A1
(416) 440-4040
Business Address: 3603 Highway 7
Unit 102
Markham Ontario L3R 8W3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3603 Highway 7
102
Markham Ontario L3R 8W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3655092311
Fax: 3655092280
Address: 36 Vodden Street East
203
Brampton Ontario L6V 4H4
Phone: 9054592700
Fax: 6476893014
Address: MCI The Doctor's Office Royal Bank
200 Bay St.
Toronto Ontario M5J 2J1
Phone: (416) 368-6787
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Seifer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Seifer (CPSO#: 104094 )
Business Address: 203-36 Vodden Street
Brampton Ontario L6V 4H4
(647) 484-3857
Business Address: 1408 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6K 1L9
(416) 532-8277
Business Address: 209 - 1 Yordale Road
Toronto Ontario M6A 2A1
(416) 440-4040
Business Address: 3603 Highway 7
Unit 102
Markham Ontario L3R 8W3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZACHARY SHANE SEIFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEIFER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZACHARY SHANE SEIFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEIFER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014