THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:16:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: State University of Groningen, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, DUTCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Neurology
5WW437
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-8500
Extension: 5055
Fax: 416-603-7733

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Jan 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Netherlands

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.D. Schaafsma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Schaafsma (CPSO#: 104151 )
Business Address: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Neurology
399 Bathurst Street
5WW- Room 437
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
416-603-8500 Extn: 5055

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, DUTCH
Medical School: State University of Groningen, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Neurology
5WW437
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-8500
Extension: 5055
Fax: 416-603-7733

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Jan 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Netherlands

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.D. Schaafsma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Schaafsma (CPSO#: 104151 )
Business Address: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Neurology
399 Bathurst Street
5WW- Room 437
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
416-603-8500 Extn: 5055

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
22 Aug 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 22 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JOANNA DANIELLE SCHAAFSMA may practise medicine independently in neurology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JOANNA DANIELLE SCHAAFSMA may practise medicine independently in neurology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: State University of Groningen, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Aug 2024
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Dec 2025
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Dec 2025

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014