THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:09:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8000 Bathurst Street Medical Clinic
2A - 8000 Bathurst Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 0B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 709-9709
Fax: (905) 709-9701
Address: 10023 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 1T7
Phone: 9059181090
Fax: 9059181204
Address: 1500-150 York St
Toronto ON M5H 3S5
Phone: 4163505900
Fax: 4163505981

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Li (CPSO#: 104157 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8000 Bathurst Street Medical Clinic
2A - 8000 Bathurst Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 0B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 709-9709
Fax: (905) 709-9701
Address: 10023 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 1T7
Phone: 9059181090
Fax: 9059181204
Address: 1500-150 York St
Toronto ON M5H 3S5
Phone: 4163505900
Fax: 4163505981

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Li (CPSO#: 104157 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERMAN HO YIN LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERMAN HO YIN LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014