THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:57:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 15 Wellesley St W
Afiya Spine & Pain Institute
Toronto ON M4Y 0G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Health Network
Department of Anesthesia
3rd floor
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-438-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pain Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Z.Pirani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Pirani (CPSO#: 104170 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough General Hospital
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 15 Wellesley St W
Afiya Spine & Pain Institute
Toronto ON M4Y 0G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Health Network
Department of Anesthesia
3rd floor
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-438-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pain Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Z.Pirani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Pirani (CPSO#: 104170 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough General Hospital
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAMEER PIRANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIRANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZAMEER PIRANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIRANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014