THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:27:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sint Eustatius, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Department of Psychiatry
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SHEENA GHODASARA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ghodasara (CPSO#: 104172 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sint Eustatius, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Department of Psychiatry
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SHEENA GHODASARA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ghodasara (CPSO#: 104172 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEENA RAMESH GHODASARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHODASARA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEENA RAMESH GHODASARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHODASARA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sint Eustatius, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014