THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 16:29:48 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 725 Bronte St S
Milton District Hospital
Milton ON L9T 9K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-878-2383
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Apr 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raphael Mark Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mark (CPSO#: 104177 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Address: 76 Grenville St
Toronto ON M5S 1B2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 725 Bronte St S
Milton District Hospital
Milton ON L9T 9K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-878-2383
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Apr 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raphael Mark Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mark (CPSO#: 104177 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Address: 76 Grenville St
Toronto ON M5S 1B2

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
22 Jun 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 22 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RAPHAEL MARK may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RAPHAEL MARK may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Jun 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Sep 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Feb 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014