THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:09:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1
1304- Commissioners Rd West
London Ontario N6K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 8503999
Fax: 519-937-1693

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Faria Rubab Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Rubab (CPSO#: 104186 )
Business Address: 510 Southdale Road East
Suite 303
London Ontario N6E 0B2
(519) 850-3999
Business Address: 1-1304 Commissioners Rd W
1304
London ON N6K 1E1
519-850-3999

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1
1304- Commissioners Rd West
London Ontario N6K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 8503999
Fax: 519-937-1693

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Faria Rubab Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Rubab (CPSO#: 104186 )
Business Address: 510 Southdale Road East
Suite 303
London Ontario N6E 0B2
(519) 850-3999
Business Address: 1-1304 Commissioners Rd W
1304
London ON N6K 1E1
519-850-3999

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARIA RUBAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBAB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARIA RUBAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBAB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014