THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:48:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nova Southeastern University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Colborne St W.
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053252201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dennis Fiddler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fiddler (CPSO#: 104233 )
Business Address: 6 McPherson Street
Minden Ontario K0M 2K0
(705) 286-2288
Business Address: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Nova Southeastern University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Colborne St W.
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053252201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dennis Fiddler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fiddler (CPSO#: 104233 )
Business Address: 6 McPherson Street
Minden Ontario K0M 2K0
(705) 286-2288
Business Address: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENNIS GEORGE FIDDLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIDDLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENNIS GEORGE FIDDLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIDDLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nova Southeastern University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014