THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:54:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 181
112 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (514)224-2997
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vivian C.H. Ma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ma (CPSO#: 104241 )
Business Address: 21 Maamuu Road
Chisasibi Quebec J0M 1E0
(819) 855-2844
Business Address: Manitoulin Health Centre
2120A ON-551
Mindemoya Ontario P0P 1S0
(705) 377-5311
Business Address: 1405 Edward Street
Hearst Ontario P0L 1N0
(705) 362-4291
Business Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
(807) 737-3030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 181
112 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (514)224-2997
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vivian C.H. Ma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ma (CPSO#: 104241 )
Business Address: 21 Maamuu Road
Chisasibi Quebec J0M 1E0
(819) 855-2844
Business Address: Manitoulin Health Centre
2120A ON-551
Mindemoya Ontario P0P 1S0
(705) 377-5311
Business Address: 1405 Edward Street
Hearst Ontario P0L 1N0
(705) 362-4291
Business Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
(807) 737-3030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIVIAN CHIA HUNG MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIVIAN CHIA HUNG MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2014