THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:12:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, KACHCHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
20-450
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166195546
Fax: 416 619 5548
Address: Mount Sinai hospital
20-450
Rehab and wellbeing
Toronto Ontario M5G1X5
Phone: (416) 619-5546
Fax: (416) 619-5548

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fahim Merali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Merali (CPSO#: 104246 )
Business Address: 600 University Ave
20-450
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
4166195546
Business Address: 1252 Lawrence Ave E
North York ON M3A 1C3
4166091100
Business Address: 1054 Monaghan Rd
Peterborough ON K9J 5L3
7053046715
Business Address: 36 Vodden St E
203
Brampton ON L6V 4H4
(905) 459-2700
Business Address: 102-3603 Highway 7 E
Markham ON L3R 8W3
(365) 509-2311

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, KACHCHI
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
20-450
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166195546
Fax: 416 619 5548
Address: Mount Sinai hospital
20-450
Rehab and wellbeing
Toronto Ontario M5G1X5
Phone: (416) 619-5546
Fax: (416) 619-5548

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fahim Merali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Merali (CPSO#: 104246 )
Business Address: 600 University Ave
20-450
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
4166195546
Business Address: 1252 Lawrence Ave E
North York ON M3A 1C3
4166091100
Business Address: 1054 Monaghan Rd
Peterborough ON K9J 5L3
7053046715
Business Address: 36 Vodden St E
203
Brampton ON L6V 4H4
(905) 459-2700
Business Address: 102-3603 Highway 7 E
Markham ON L3R 8W3
(365) 509-2311

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAHIM MERALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERALI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAHIM MERALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERALI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014