THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:50:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAGALOG

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7259
Fax: 7055237269
Address: 865 Regent Street
Sudbury Cardiac Outpatient Centre
Suite M3-015, third floor
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
Phone: 7055237259
Fax: 7055237269

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Feb 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angelo Dave Javier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Javier (CPSO#: 104255 )
Business Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAGALOG
Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7259
Fax: 7055237269
Address: 865 Regent Street
Sudbury Cardiac Outpatient Centre
Suite M3-015, third floor
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
Phone: 7055237259
Fax: 7055237269

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Feb 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angelo Dave Javier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Javier (CPSO#: 104255 )
Business Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Feb 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ANGELO DAVE CRISOTOMO JAVIER may practise medicine independently in Cardiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ANGELO DAVE CRISOTOMO JAVIER may practise medicine independently in Cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Feb 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014