THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:55:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 340 High St
Brightshores Health System - Southampton Hospital
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 797-3230
Extension: x3237
Fax: 5197973755

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael A. Pace Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pace (CPSO#: 104256 )
Business Address: 340 High Street
Brightshores Health System - Southampton Hospital
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
(519) 797-3230 Extn: 3237

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 340 High St
Brightshores Health System - Southampton Hospital
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 797-3230
Extension: x3237
Fax: 5197973755

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael A. Pace Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pace (CPSO#: 104256 )
Business Address: 340 High Street
Brightshores Health System - Southampton Hospital
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
(519) 797-3230 Extn: 3237

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALLAN PACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALLAN PACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014