THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:14:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: UNIVERSIDADE GAMA FILHO, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Regional Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
800 Commisioners Rd E
Room A3-940
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8640
Extension: 53292
Fax: 519-685-8808

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 14 Jul 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 14 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance Stratford
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ricardo de Vasconcelos Fernandes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. R. de Vasconcelos Fernandes (CPSO#: 104264 )
Business Address: London Regional Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
790 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 4L6
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 52764

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: UNIVERSIDADE GAMA FILHO, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Regional Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
800 Commisioners Rd E
Room A3-940
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8640
Extension: 53292
Fax: 519-685-8808

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 14 Jul 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 14 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance Stratford
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ricardo de Vasconcelos Fernandes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. R. de Vasconcelos Fernandes (CPSO#: 104264 )
Business Address: London Regional Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
790 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 4L6
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 52764

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
14 Jul 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 14 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RICARDO AUGUSTO DE VASCONCELOS FERNANDES may practise medicine independently in medical oncology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RICARDO AUGUSTO DE VASCONCELOS FERNANDES may practise medicine independently in medical oncology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: UNIVERSIDADE GAMA FILHO, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Jul 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014