THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:24:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Surgery
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 01 May 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C M Haller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Haller (CPSO#: 104292 )
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
+1 416 813 7564 x415650
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
c/o C. Haller Division of Cardiovascular Surgery
PSC Room No. 17-14-068
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
+1 416 813 7654 x415650

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Surgery
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 01 May 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C M Haller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Haller (CPSO#: 104292 )
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
+1 416 813 7564 x415650
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
c/o C. Haller Division of Cardiovascular Surgery
PSC Room No. 17-14-068
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
+1 416 813 7654 x415650

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Sep 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 07 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. CHRISTOPH MARC HALLER may practise medicine independently in cardiac surgery.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. CHRISTOPH MARC HALLER may practise medicine independently in cardiac surgery.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Sep 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 May 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014