THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:50:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-1943 Ironoak Way
Oakville Ontario L6H 3V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053348844
Fax: 6474805031
Address: 399 Bathurst Street
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurology
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Fax: 4166035622

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danny Monsour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Monsour (CPSO#: 104299 )
Business Address: 200-418 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M5N 1A2
6474830690

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-1943 Ironoak Way
Oakville Ontario L6H 3V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053348844
Fax: 6474805031
Address: 399 Bathurst Street
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurology
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Fax: 4166035622

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danny Monsour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Monsour (CPSO#: 104299 )
Business Address: 200-418 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M5N 1A2
6474830690

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANNY ADEL MONSOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONSOUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANNY ADEL MONSOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONSOUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014