THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:24:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Division of Vascular Surgery
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael M. Yacob Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yacob (CPSO#: 104300 )
Business Address: Kingston Health Science Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-4157

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Division of Vascular Surgery
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael M. Yacob Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yacob (CPSO#: 104300 )
Business Address: Kingston Health Science Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-4157

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL MINA YACOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YACOB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL MINA YACOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YACOB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014